|
09/29/2020
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 245, Statutes of 2020.
|
|
|
|
09/29/2020
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/04/2020
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2020
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2020
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4377.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/14/2020
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/13/2020
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/31/2020
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/01/2020
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/16/2020
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/15/2020
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 4852.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/08/2020
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 4689.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/03/2020
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2020
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (June 2).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/14/2020
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/13/2020
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/12/2020
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (May 11).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/06/2020
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/05/2020
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/20/2020
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2020
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|