California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2517 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 19, 2020

Enrolled

Bill August 31, 2020

Chaptered

Bill September 29, 2020

Amended

Bill June 8, 2020
Bill May 13, 2020
Bill May 5, 2020
Bill May 4, 2020