|
07/31/2019
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 160, Statutes of 2019.
|
|
|
|
07/31/2019
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/23/2019
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/11/2019
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/11/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2056.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/03/2019
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 24).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2019
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2019
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/22/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1792.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (May 16).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/20/2019
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/12/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (March 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/24/2019
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 23.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/23/2019
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|