|
09/18/2020
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 101, Statutes of 2020.
|
|
|
|
09/18/2020
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/11/2020
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2020
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 5327.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2020
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2020
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4377.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/14/2020
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/13/2020
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/01/2020
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (August 1). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2020
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/23/2020
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2020
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/08/2020
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 4727.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2020
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (June 2).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/21/2020
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2020
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/19/2020
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 18).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/05/2020
|
Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/04/2020
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/17/2020
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/12/2020
|
Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/20/2020
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2020
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|