California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2520 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 19, 2020

Enrolled

Bill September 1, 2020

Chaptered

Bill September 18, 2020

Amended

Bill June 26, 2020
Bill May 20, 2020
Bill May 4, 2020