Senate | 07/01/2020 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Senate | 06/11/2020 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 06/10/2020 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 44. Noes 17. Page 4802.) | ||
Assembly | 05/22/2020 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 05/21/2020 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (May 20). | ||
Assembly | 05/05/2020 | Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. | ||
Assembly | 05/04/2020 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 03/12/2020 | Referred to Com. on H. & C.D. | ||
Assembly | 02/21/2020 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. | ||
Assembly | 02/20/2020 | Read first time. To print. |