|
09/11/2020
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 62, Statutes of 2020.
|
|
|
|
09/11/2020
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/08/2020
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2020
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 5378.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2020
|
From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (August 30).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2020
|
Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 5274.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2020
|
Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2020
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2020
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4380.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/25/2020
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/20/2020
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 20).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/20/2020
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/13/2020
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/30/2020
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/27/2020
|
Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/27/2020
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/27/2020
|
Withdrawn from committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/02/2020
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/23/2020
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/28/2020
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/27/2020
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 3890.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/23/2020
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (January 23).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/23/2020
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/16/2020
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/15/2020
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/15/2020
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (January 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/06/2020
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on ED. Re-referred. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (January 6). Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/06/2020
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/06/2020
|
Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/06/2020
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/02/2019
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/19/2019
|
In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/12/2019
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/07/2019
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/29/2019
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 28.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/28/2019
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|