California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB276 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 28, 2019

Enrolled

Bill September 1, 2020

Chaptered

Bill September 11, 2020

Amended

Bill July 2, 2020
Bill January 15, 2020
Bill January 6, 2020
Bill March 21, 2019
Bill February 21, 2019