|
10/12/2019
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 791, Statutes of 2019.
|
|
|
|
10/12/2019
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/25/2019
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/14/2019
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 58. Noes 6. Page 3614.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/14/2019
|
Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Page 3614.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/14/2019
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/14/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 2958.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/05/2019
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/04/2019
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 30).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2019
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/13/2019
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/12/2019
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (July 9).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2019
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2019
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 57. Noes 13. Page 2007.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/22/2019
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 1775.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/13/2019
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 1615.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/11/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/10/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 1.) (April 10).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/26/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (March 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
12/04/2018
|
From printer. May be heard in committee January 3.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
12/03/2018
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|