California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB29 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 3, 2018

Enrolled

Bill September 18, 2019

Chaptered

Bill October 12, 2019

Amended

Bill September 5, 2019
Bill August 13, 2019
Bill May 22, 2019
Bill May 13, 2019