Senate | 07/01/2020 | Referred to Coms. on JUD. and APPR. | ||
Senate | 06/16/2020 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 06/15/2020 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 4849.) | ||
Assembly | 06/10/2020 | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 4746.) | ||
Assembly | 05/28/2020 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 05/27/2020 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (May 27). | ||
Assembly | 05/19/2020 | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Assembly | 05/18/2020 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 05/07/2020 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Assembly | 04/24/2020 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Assembly | 02/24/2020 | Read first time. | ||
Assembly | 02/22/2020 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. | ||
Assembly | 02/21/2020 | Introduced. To print. |