06/26/2019 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 10, Statutes of 2019. | |||
06/26/2019 | Approved by the Governor. | |||
Assembly | 06/20/2019 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. | ||
Assembly | 06/18/2019 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 06/17/2019 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1606.). | ||
Senate | 06/05/2019 | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. | ||
Senate | 06/04/2019 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 4). | ||
Senate | 04/24/2019 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Senate | 03/18/2019 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 03/18/2019 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 708.) | ||
Assembly | 03/12/2019 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (March 12). | ||
Assembly | 02/01/2019 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 3. | ||
Assembly | 01/31/2019 | Read first time. To print. |