|
10/10/2019
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 710, Statutes of 2019.
|
|
|
|
10/10/2019
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/18/2019
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/10/2019
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 51. Noes 22. Page 3274.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/10/2019
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 3252.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/09/2019
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 11 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/09/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 27. Noes 12. Page 2688.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/04/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/03/2019
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 30).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/12/2019
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/10/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (July 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L., P.E. & R. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/17/2019
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2019
|
Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and L., P.E. & R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2019
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 49. Noes 22. Page 2016.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 16).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2019
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/03/2019
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/25/2019
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/21/2019
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/20/2019
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (March 20).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/17/2019
|
Referred to Com. on L. & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
12/04/2018
|
From printer. May be heard in committee January 3.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
12/03/2018
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|