California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB35 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 3, 2018

Enrolled

Bill September 13, 2019

Chaptered

Bill October 10, 2019

Amended

Bill September 3, 2019
Bill March 21, 2019