|
10/10/2019
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 713, Statutes of 2019.
|
|
|
|
10/10/2019
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/11/2019
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/06/2019
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/05/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 30. Noes 10. Page 2573.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 30).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/12/2019
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/03/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (July 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/12/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2019
|
Referred to Coms. on L., P.E. & R. and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2019
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/25/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1359.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/11/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/10/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 10).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/03/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/18/2019
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/11/2019
|
Referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/05/2019
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 7.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/04/2019
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|