California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB357 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 4, 2019

Enrolled

Bill September 13, 2019

Amended

Bill June 19, 2019
Bill May 16, 2019
Bill April 11, 2019
Bill March 7, 2019