|
10/12/2019
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 792, Statutes of 2019.
|
|
|
|
10/12/2019
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/12/2019
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/09/2019
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 71. Noes 3. Page 3117.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/05/2019
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 7 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/04/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 5. Page 2517.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/03/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2019
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2019
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (August 30).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2019
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2019
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/12/2019
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (June 12).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2019
|
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2019
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/23/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 69. Noes 1. Page 1854.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 1.) (May 16).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/24/2019
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/09/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 1.) (April 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/20/2019
|
Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/19/2019
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/11/2019
|
In committee: Hearing for testimony only.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/17/2019
|
Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
12/04/2018
|
From printer. May be heard in committee January 3.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
12/03/2018
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|