California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB37 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 3, 2018

Enrolled

Bill September 10, 2019

Chaptered

Bill October 12, 2019

Amended

Bill August 30, 2019
Bill June 13, 2019
Bill March 19, 2019