|
01/21/2020
|
Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
|
|
|
|
10/02/2019
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/23/2019
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/11/2019
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 1. Page 3379.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/11/2019
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 3370.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/10/2019
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 12 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/10/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2782.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/09/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/06/2019
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 30).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2019
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2019
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/13/2019
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/12/2019
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (July 9).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2019
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/12/2019
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on N.R. & W. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 5).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2019
|
Referred to Coms. on EQ. and N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2019
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/22/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 1. Page 1257.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/10/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 10).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/03/2019
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/02/2019
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/01/2019
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 1.) (March 25).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/15/2019
|
Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/07/2019
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 9.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/06/2019
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|