California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB493 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 12, 2019

Enrolled

Bill September 16, 2019

Chaptered

Bill October 12, 2019

Amended

Bill September 6, 2019
Bill June 14, 2019
Bill May 16, 2019
Bill April 2, 2019