|
09/12/2019
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 287, Statutes of 2019.
|
|
|
|
09/12/2019
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/05/2019
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2019
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 66. Noes 0. Page 2894.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/27/2019
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 29 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2019
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2287.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/14/2019
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/01/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2019
|
Referred to Com. on E., U. & C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2019
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2019
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 66. Noes 0. Page 2026.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (May 16).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/01/2019
|
In committee: Set, second hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/24/2019
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/23/2019
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/22/2019
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/10/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/21/2019
|
Referred to Com. on C. & C.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/13/2019
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 15.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/12/2019
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|