California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB497 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 12, 2019

Enrolled

Bill September 3, 2019

Chaptered

Bill September 12, 2019

Amended

Bill August 14, 2019
Bill April 22, 2019