|
09/25/2020
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 155, Statutes of 2020.
|
|
|
|
09/25/2020
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/08/2020
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2020
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 5311.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2020
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2020
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4383.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2020
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2020
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/20/2020
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/20/2020
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 20).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2020
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/14/2020
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (August 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/31/2020
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/23/2020
|
Referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/28/2020
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/27/2020
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 3891.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/23/2020
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (January 23).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/23/2020
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/16/2020
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/15/2020
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/15/2020
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (January 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/06/2020
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P. Re-referred. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (January 6). Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/22/2019
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96(a).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/22/2019
|
Re-referred to Com. on INS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/11/2019
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on INS. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/21/2019
|
Referred to Com. on INS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/14/2019
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 16.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/13/2019
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|