California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB499 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 13, 2019

Enrolled

Bill September 1, 2020

Chaptered

Bill September 25, 2020

Amended

Bill August 20, 2020
Bill July 31, 2020
Bill July 8, 2020
Bill January 15, 2020
Bill April 11, 2019