|
01/21/2020
|
Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
|
|
|
|
10/08/2019
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/23/2019
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/11/2019
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3408.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/11/2019
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 3370.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/10/2019
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 12 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/10/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2747.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/09/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/06/2019
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2019
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2019
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 30).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/01/2019
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/19/2019
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 11). Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2019
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2019
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2019
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2019
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/25/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 815.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/20/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/19/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (March 19).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/19/2019
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/04/2019
|
Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/28/2019
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/14/2019
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 16.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/13/2019
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|