California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB524 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 13, 2019

Enrolled

Bill September 16, 2019

Amended

Bill September 6, 2019
Bill August 30, 2019
Bill May 6, 2019
Bill February 28, 2019