|
09/20/2019
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 303, Statutes of 2019.
|
|
|
|
09/20/2019
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/03/2019
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2019
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2835.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2019
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 24 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2244.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2019
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/10/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/09/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (July 9).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/03/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on V.A. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 2). Re-referred to Com. on V.A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2019
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2019
|
Referred to Coms. on JUD. and V.A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2019
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/04/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 1040.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/28/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/27/2019
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/26/2019
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (March 26).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/25/2019
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/14/2019
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 16.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/13/2019
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|