California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB558 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 13, 2019

Enrolled

Bill August 27, 2019

Chaptered

Bill September 20, 2019

Amended

Bill June 27, 2019
Bill March 27, 2019