|
10/02/2019
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 429, Statutes of 2019.
|
|
|
|
10/02/2019
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/11/2019
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/05/2019
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 3017.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/03/2019
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 5 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/03/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 31. Noes 9. Page 2440.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/09/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/08/2019
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2019
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L., P.E. & R. (Ayes 11. Noes 2.) (June 18). Re-referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2019
|
Referred to Coms. on E., U. & C. and L., P.E. & R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2019
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/13/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 67. Noes 4. Page 1627.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/08/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 2.) (May 8).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/25/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/03/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 3). Re-referred to Com. on L. & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/11/2019
|
Re-referred to Com. on U. & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/07/2019
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on U. & E. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/07/2019
|
Referred to Coms. on U. & E. and L. & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/14/2019
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 16.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/13/2019
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|