California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB560 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 13, 2019

Enrolled

Bill September 6, 2019

Chaptered

Bill October 2, 2019

Amended

Bill June 20, 2019
Bill March 7, 2019