|
08/30/2019
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 177, Statutes of 2019.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2019
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2019
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2019
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2183.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/13/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/12/2019
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/02/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2019
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2019
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 1763.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/11/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/10/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 10).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/26/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (March 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2019
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/15/2019
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|