|
10/02/2019
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 433, Statutes of 2019.
|
|
|
|
10/02/2019
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/05/2019
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2019
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 2890.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2019
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 17 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2183.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/13/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/12/2019
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/08/2019
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/05/2019
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (July 3).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2019
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2019
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2019
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/23/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1873.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (May 16).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/24/2019
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/10/2019
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/09/2019
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/08/2019
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 2).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/26/2019
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2019
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/15/2019
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|