California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB678 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 15, 2019

Enrolled

Bill September 3, 2019

Chaptered

Bill October 2, 2019

Amended

Bill July 8, 2019
Bill April 9, 2019