|
07/09/2019
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 63, Statutes of 2019.
|
|
|
|
07/09/2019
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/02/2019
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/27/2019
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 26. Noes 6. Page 1817.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (June 4).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2019
|
Referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2019
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/09/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1587.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/02/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/01/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 1).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/27/2019
|
Re-referred to Com. on E. & R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/26/2019
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/25/2019
|
Referred to Com. on E. & R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2019
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/15/2019
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|