|
10/09/2019
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 679, Statutes of 2019.
|
|
|
|
10/09/2019
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/05/2019
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2019
|
Urgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 2904.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/27/2019
|
From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (August 27).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2019
|
Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/13/2019
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 15 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/12/2019
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2138.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/02/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/01/2019
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2019
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/10/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2019
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2019
|
Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2019
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/25/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1360.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/11/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/10/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 10).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/02/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (April 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/28/2019
|
Referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2019
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/15/2019
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|