California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB690 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 15, 2019

Enrolled

Bill September 3, 2019

Chaptered

Bill October 9, 2019

Amended

Bill July 1, 2019
Bill June 5, 2019