Senate
|
06/24/2020
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2019
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2019
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2019
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/08/2019
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/05/2019
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (July 3).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2019
|
Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2019
|
Withdrawn from committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/19/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on V.A. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (June 18). Re-referred to Com. on V.A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2019
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HOUSING.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2019
|
Referred to Coms. on HOUSING, V.A. and GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2019
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/24/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 68. Noes 0. Page 1985.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/17/2019
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2019
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 16).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/24/2019
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/10/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/10/2019
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/03/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on V.A. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 3). Re-referred to Com. on V.A.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/28/2019
|
Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and V.A.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/20/2019
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2019
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|