California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB694 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 19, 2019

Amended

Bill June 24, 2020
Bill June 11, 2020
Bill August 13, 2019
Bill July 8, 2019
Bill June 6, 2019
Bill May 17, 2019