|
02/13/2019
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 2, Statutes of 2019.
|
|
|
|
02/13/2019
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/12/2019
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 9:45 a.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/11/2019
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 160.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (February 7).
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2019
|
Referred to Com. on B. & F.R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/04/2019
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/04/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 278.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/30/2019
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/29/2019
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 28. Noes 0.) (January 29).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/29/2019
|
Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/28/2019
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on BUDGET. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/24/2019
|
Referred to Com. on BUDGET.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
12/04/2018
|
From printer. May be heard in committee January 3.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
12/03/2018
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|