California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB73 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 3, 2018

Enrolled

Bill February 11, 2019

Chaptered

Bill February 13, 2019

Amended

Bill January 30, 2019
Bill January 28, 2019