|
09/30/2020
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 321, Statutes of 2020.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2020
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/08/2020
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2020
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 63. Noes 0. Page 5358.).
|
|
|
|
08/29/2020
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 1. Page 4432.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/29/2020
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/29/2020
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 1.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2020
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/20/2020
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (August 20).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/20/2020
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/13/2020
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/01/2020
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (July 31). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/27/2020
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/23/2020
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/28/2020
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/27/2020
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 63. Noes 0. Page 3903.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/27/2020
|
Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 58. Noes 18. Page 3893.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/23/2020
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (January 23).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2019
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/10/2019
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/26/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (March 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/25/2019
|
Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/21/2019
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/20/2019
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2019
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|