California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB732 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 19, 2019

Enrolled

Bill September 1, 2020

Chaptered

Bill September 30, 2020

Amended

Bill August 20, 2020
Bill July 27, 2020
Bill July 2, 2020
Bill January 23, 2020
Bill March 21, 2019