|
01/21/2020
|
Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
|
|
|
|
10/13/2019
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/13/2019
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/09/2019
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3126.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/05/2019
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 7 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/04/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2520.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/03/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2019
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 30).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2019
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/12/2019
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/09/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (July 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/01/2019
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2019
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2019
|
Referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2019
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/23/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1940.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2019
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (May 16).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/10/2019
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/27/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (March 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/19/2019
|
Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/18/2019
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/28/2019
|
Referred to Com. on HUM. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/20/2019
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2019
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|