California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB734 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 19, 2019

Enrolled

Bill September 11, 2019

Amended

Bill August 30, 2019
Bill July 1, 2019
Bill June 17, 2019
Bill May 16, 2019
Bill March 18, 2019