|
09/09/2020
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 44, Statutes of 2020.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2020
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2020
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2020
|
Urgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 5222.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2020
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 26 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2020
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 4290.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/14/2020
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/13/2020
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/07/2020
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/06/2020
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (August 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/01/2020
|
Re-referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2020
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2020
|
Withdrawn from committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2020
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2019
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2019
|
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2019
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/02/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1476.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/25/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/24/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (April 24).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/09/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/25/2019
|
In committee: Hearing for testimony only.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/28/2019
|
Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/20/2019
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2019
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|