California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB736 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 19, 2019

Enrolled

Bill August 27, 2020

Chaptered

Bill September 9, 2020

Amended

Bill August 7, 2020
Bill February 14, 2020