|
08/30/2019
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 180, Statutes of 2019.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2019
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2019
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2019
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2747.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2019
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 17 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2180.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/02/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/01/2019
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/12/2019
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2019
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 10).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2019
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2019
|
Referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2019
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/25/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1359.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/11/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/10/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 9).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/02/2019
|
Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/01/2019
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/28/2019
|
Referred to Com. on HUM. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/20/2019
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2019
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|