California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB737 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 19, 2019

Enrolled

Bill August 20, 2019

Chaptered

Bill August 30, 2019

Amended

Bill July 1, 2019
Bill June 12, 2019
Bill May 29, 2019
Bill April 1, 2019