|
09/12/2019
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 290, Statutes of 2019.
|
|
|
|
09/12/2019
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/03/2019
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2019
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2836.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2019
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 24 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2244.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2019
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/09/2019
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/08/2019
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (July 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2019
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2019
|
Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2019
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/28/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 917.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/27/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/26/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (March 26).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/28/2019
|
Referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/20/2019
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2019
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|