California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB775 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 19, 2019

Enrolled

Bill August 27, 2019

Chaptered

Bill September 12, 2019

Amended

Bill July 9, 2019
Bill June 25, 2019